Churchill academy board of directors
WebFind out more about our management team and Board of Directors that make up the outstanding team of the Church and Dwight Corporate Company. WebExecutive Director of Academics. Dr. Jaime Christensen has been with Spectrum Academy since 2007. She served as elementary and secondary school principal prior to being appointed the Director of Academics. Jaime earned her undergraduate degree from Westminster College and her graduate degrees from the University of Memphis.
Churchill academy board of directors
Did you know?
WebChurch Hill Activities & Tutoring (CHAT) is a nonprofit serving the youth of Richmond’s East End through the After School Program, Church Hill Academy, and Workforce Development Program. WebBruce B. Churchill serves as a member of our Board of Directors. From August 2014 to April 2024, Mr. Churchill served on the board of directors of Computer Sciences …
WebTrina Christensen is the Director of Sistema Utah which services over 360 students annually in West Valley City, Utah. Sistema Utah has won five … WebChurch & Dwight Co., Inc. Princeton South Corporate Center. 500 Charles Ewing Blvd. Ewing, NJ 08628. 1 (800) 833-9532
WebThe Churchill School and Center Board of Trustees is dedicated to supporting and furthering the mission of the school. Find out how. WebDec 13, 2014 · Here students gain confidence in themselves and confidence in their ability to learn. Students find their wings at Churchill Academy and move on much better …
WebCynthia C. Wainwright is President of The Churchill School and Center as well as The Bridge, Inc., a citywide mental health agency. She also serves on the boards of Roundabout Theatre Company, the Children’s Museum of the Arts and the Historic House Trust of New York City. Cynthia retired as Deputy Director of Corporate Social Responsibility ...
WebPeople & Committees. The Company is controlled by the Board of Directors. The Board comprises three Executive and four Non-executive Directors. Alan McWalter, the Non-executive Chairman, is responsible for the running of the Board and David O'Connor, the Chief Executive, has executive responsibility for running the Company's business and ... image for christmas giftsWebMar 21, 2011 · LOUISVILLE, Ky., March 21, 2011 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- Churchill Downs Incorporated ("CDI" or "the Company") (Nasdaq:CHDN) today announced that Carl F. Pollard, chairman of CDI's board of directors, will not stand for reelection and will retire from his position and from CDI's board directors on June 16, 2011. Pollard joined CDI's … image ford 3500 tractorWebThe Board has several standing committees, which work on behalf of the entire Board to meet the current and future needs of the school. These … imageforcreation.orgWebPeople & Committees. The Company is controlled by the Board of Directors. The Board comprises three Executive and four Non-executive Directors. Alan McWalter, the Non … image for coaching centerimage forcepsWebMeet the Board Ms. Tricia Strasdin President Term: Jun. 23, 2016 to Dec. 31, 2024 Phone: 775-426-8014 Address: 1040 W. 5th St. Fallon, NV 89406 Email: … image for curse forge modpackWebBrian T. Marley. Director. Brian T. Marley has served on the Board and as a member and Chair of the Audit Committee since June 2024 and served as a member of the board of managers of New Academy Holding Company, LLC from January 2024 until June 2024. Mr. Marley is the founder and has served as Managing Partner of Marley Associates LLC, … image for company growth